Tuition

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0012 / CH0543Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships - Eligibility, Award Amounts, and Use of FundsDelegate Howard, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 543Ways and Means
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0033Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Retirement Account Withdrawals for Higher Education TuitionDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0224 / CH0826Higher Education - AmeriCorps Program Participants - In-State TuitionDelegate LiermanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 826Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0266 / CH0332
    (SB0327 / CH0331)
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Financial Aid - Reduction RestrictionsDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 332Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0413
    (SB0319 / CH0591)
Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
HB0462 / CH0321
    (SB0701 / CH0320)
Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - AlterationsDelegate Young, P.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0509 / CH0658
    (SB0429)
Higher Education - Student Loan Notification LetterDelegate HettlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 658Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0848
    (SB0678)
Community Colleges - Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate's Degrees - Tuition AssistanceDelegate SteinIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0865Higher Education - Financial Aid - In-State Students (The Jill Wrigley Memorial Scholarship Expansion Act)Delegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0900Income Tax Credit - Payment of Tuition at a Community CollegeDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0931Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2017Delegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1240 / CH0715Individualized Education Programs - StudiesDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 715Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1508
    (SB1000)
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - ExemptionsDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1608
    (SB1131)
Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or FeesDelegate OttoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCommunity Colleges - Local Bills (F4)
SB0319 / CH0591
    (HB0413)
Pathways in Technology Early College High (P-TECH) School Act of 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 591Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Higher Education (F2)
SB0327 / CH0331
    (HB0266 / CH0332)
Public Senior Higher Education Institutions - Financial Aid - Reduction RestrictionsSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 331Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0429
    (HB0509 / CH0658)
Higher Education - Student Loan Notification LetterSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0557Education - Maryland Education Opportunity Account Program - EstablishedSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0678
    (HB0848)
Community Colleges - Vocational Certificates, Apprenticeship Training Programs, and Associate's Degrees - Tuition AssistanceSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)
SB0701 / CH0320
    (HB0462 / CH0321)
Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - AlterationsSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 320Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1000
    (HB1508)
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - ExemptionsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1131
    (HB1608)
Somerset County - Community College - Eligibility of Students to Pay No Tuition or FeesSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Community Colleges - Local Bills (F4)
SB1173Higher Education Degree and Job Certification Without Debt Act of 2017Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Higher Education (F2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:53 A.M.