Uncompensated Care

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 2

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1215 / CH0445
    (SB0630)
Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services ProvidedDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 445Health and Government Operations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0630
    (HB1215 / CH0445)
Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services ProvidedSenator MadalenoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.