Unemployment

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0018Maryland Education Opportunity Act of 2016Delegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0262
    (SB0805)
Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - AlterationDelegate Washington, M.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
HB0420 / CH0522
    (SB0417 / CH0521)
Individuals With Disabilities - Minimum Wage and Community Integration (Ken Capone Equal Employment Act)Delegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 522Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0450
    (SB0386)
Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment ZonesSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0584Economic Development - One Maryland Tax Credit - ExpansionDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0700
    (SB0679 / CH0574)
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Nail TechniciansDelegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
HB0748Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Job Training Grant Program - EstablishmentDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1034Income Tax - Job Creation Tax Credit - Long-Term Unemployed IndividualsDelegate PlattIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1106
    (SB0921)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsDelegate FrickVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1334
    (SB0777 / CH0697)
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Messenger Service BusinessDelegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
HB1605Unemployment Insurance - Safe Harbor - EstablishmentDelegate AdamsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsUnemployment Insurance (K2)
HB1633
    (SB1145)
Unemployment Insurance - Maximum Benefit - IncreaseDelegate GlennIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsUnemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0074 / CH0336Unemployment Insurance - Effect of Retirement Payments on Eligibility for Benefits - RevisionChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 336Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0084 / CH0337Unemployment Insurance - Calculation and Application of Table of Rates - RevisionChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 337Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0086 / CH0339Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Actively Seeking Work Requirement - RepealChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 339Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0090 / CH0342Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for FraudChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0094 / CH0344Workforce Development - RevisionsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0098 / CH0017Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - AlterationChair, Finance CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
SB0386
    (HB0450)
Tax Credits - Manufacturing Empowerment ZonesPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0417 / CH0521
    (HB0420 / CH0522)
Individuals With Disabilities - Minimum Wage and Community Integration (Ken Capone Equal Employment Act)Senator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 521Finance
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0679 / CH0574
    (HB0700)
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Nail TechniciansSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 574Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUnemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0777 / CH0697
    (HB1334)
Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Messenger Service BusinessSenator AstleEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697Finance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUnemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0805
    (HB0262)
Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - AlterationSenator PughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
SB0921
    (HB1106)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsSenator PughVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Finance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB1014Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesUtility Regulation (C5)
SB1145
    (HB1633)
Unemployment Insurance - Maximum Benefit - IncreaseSenator MiddletonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsUnemployment Insurance (K2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.