Unfair Trade Practices

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0126 / CH0350Consumer Protection - Maryland Consumer Protection Act - ScopeDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 350Economic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0291 / CH0465
    (SB0383 / CH0464)
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 465Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0316
    (SB0374 / CH0246)
Consumer Protection - Children's Online Privacy ProtectionDelegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0332
    (SB0185)
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and ServicesDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0432
    (SB0316)
Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and EmployeesFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersEthics (G2)
HB0878Consumer Protection - Store Credit Cards for Rebates and Returned Merchandise - Required NoticeDelegate Turner, V.In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1212
    (SB0709)
Consumer Protection - Negative Option Feature - RestrictionsDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1215 / CH0408Consumer Protection - Home Appliances and Warranty Enforcement - StudyDelegate WalkerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 408Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1218Consumer Protection - Payment by Credit Card - Prohibition of SurchargeDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1469Consumer Protection - Consumer Goods Offered at a Sale Price - Rain ChecksDelegate Turner, F.In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive NominationsCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0116Commercial Law - Cancellation of Sales of Motor Vehicles and Internet SalesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0185
    (HB0332)
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and ServicesSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0374 / CH0246
    (HB0316)
Office of the Attorney General - Workgroup on Children's Online Privacy ProtectionSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 246Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0376Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and ServicesSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePublic Safety (E4)
SB0383 / CH0464
    (HB0291 / CH0465)
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services ActSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 464Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Real Property (N1)
SB0709
    (HB1212)
Consumer Protection - Negative Option Feature - RestrictionsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.