Unfair Trade Practices

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0098
    (SB0154 / CH0042)
Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - ProhibitionDelegate AroraVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0244
    (SB0776)
Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory PracticesDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0652Consumer Protection - Negative Option Feature - RestrictionsDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0676Consumer Protection - Required Disclosure of Social Security Number - ProhibitionDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0704 / CH0277
    (SB0160 / CH0276)
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting ExtensionDelegate VaughnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 277Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0788Mobile Phone Companies - Third-Party Vendor Billing - RestrictionsDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0846Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Viatical Settlement Contracts - Long-Term Care ServicesDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0924
    (SB0950)
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required NoticeDelegate AroraIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0098 / CH0025Health Insurance - Medicare Marketing RulesChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 25Finance
1/15/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0154 / CH0042
    (HB0098)
Commercial Law - Interference With Internet Ticket Sales - ProhibitionSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Finance
1/22/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Economic Matters Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0160 / CH0276
    (HB0704 / CH0277)
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting ExtensionSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 276Finance
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0776
    (HB0244)
Libraries - Electronic Book Licenses and Sales - Discriminatory PracticesSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0950
    (HB0924)
Consumer Protection - Monitoring Consumer Behavior and Shopping Habits - Required NoticeSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.