Unfair Trade Practices

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0674
    (SB0168)
Maryland Paint Stewardship ProgramDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1114
    (SB0892)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing SystemsDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1120 / CH0560
    (SB1004)
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance StandardsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 560Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1173Real Property - Rent-to-Own Agreements and Contracts - RequirementsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Real Property (N1)
HB1494
    (SB0459 / CH0807)
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment ProhibitionDelegate Wilson, C.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesJudiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
RulesInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1499Consumer Protection - Bank Overdraft Plans - RequirementsDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1617State Personnel - Collective Bargaining - State Institutions of Higher EducationDelegate JacksonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0168
    (HB0674)
Maryland Paint Stewardship ProgramSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0459 / CH0807
    (HB1494)
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment ProhibitionSenator FeldmanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0566Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers and DealersSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0892
    (HB1114)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing SystemsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB1004
    (HB1120 / CH0560)
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance StandardsSenator HoughIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB1200Internet Consumer Privacy Rights Act of 2017Senator RosapepeIn the House - Referred Economic MattersFinance
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.