Unfair Trade Practices

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0237Community Colleges - Unfair Labor Practices - ProhibitionDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0635
    (SB0837)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer ContractsDelegate SydnorIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEconomic Matters
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0740 / CH0825
    (SB0693 / CH0826)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain NamesDelegate ClippingerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 825Economic Matters
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1080Consumer Protection - Cleaning Product Right-to-Know ActDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1090 / CH0515Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018Delegate AfzaliApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1372Consumer Protection - Consumer Contracts Renewal - RestrictionsDelegate WaldstreicherIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1513Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses ActDelegate FennellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1634 / CH0731
    (SB1068 / CH0732)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Delegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 731Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1655Commercial Law - Privacy and Net Neutrality ProtectionsDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1759Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle RentalsDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0693 / CH0826
    (HB0740 / CH0825)
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain NamesSenator FeldmanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 826Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0743 / CH0852
    (HB1045)
Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing ProgramsSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 852Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0837
    (HB0635)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer ContractsSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB1047Consumer Protection - Scanning or Swiping Identification Cards and Driver's Licenses - ProhibitionSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:04 P.M.