Unions

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0030Frederick County Public Charter School Program - EstablishmentDelegate SchulzIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansWays and MeansEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0041Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and VolunteersDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0104Montgomery County - Transit Authority MC 24-15Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
Ways and Means
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0158 / CH0403
    (SB0243)
State Personnel and Procurement - Service Contracts - Reporting and Audit RequirementsDelegate HaynesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 403Appropriations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0219Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and ReportingDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0249Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to WorkDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0486
    (SB0595 / CH0311)
Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0895
    (SB0466 / CH0352)
Baltimore County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps InstructorsBaltimore County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0966Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0993
    (SB0752)
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining DisputesCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0243
    (HB0158 / CH0403)
State Personnel and Procurement - Service Contracts - Reporting and Audit RequirementsSenator FeldmanVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0466 / CH0352
    (HB0895)
Baltimore County - Education - Junior Reserve Officer Training Corps InstructorsSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Finance
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0595 / CH0311
    (HB0486)
Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0683State Board of Education - Next Generation Schools - EstablishedSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0752
    (HB0993)
Charles County Sheriff - Arbitration of Collective Bargaining DisputesSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.