Unions

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0027Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingDelegate HaynesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0145Public School Labor Relations Board - Renegotiation Procedures and AdministrationDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0343
    (SB0993)
Procurement - Equal Pay Certificates - RequirementDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0454 / CH0037
    (SB0378 / CH0023)
State Employees - Merit Increases in SalarySpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0736Labor and Employment - Employment Rights for Local Government Employees - EstablishmentDelegate TarlauIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Generally (L1)
HB0795Maryland Environmental Service - Collective BargainingDelegate Young, P.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0813
    (SB0618)
Higher Education - Employee Rights - Equal Employment Opportunity Program and Maryland Whistleblower LawDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1038Labor and Employment - Labor Organizations - Right to WorkDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0101Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor DisputesChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0363Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0378 / CH0023
    (HB0454 / CH0037)
State Employees - Merit Increases in SalaryPresidentEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0447Maryland Environmental Service - Collective BargainingSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0618
    (HB0813)
Higher Education - Employee Rights - Equal Employment Opportunity Program and Maryland Whistleblower LawSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0690State Labor Relations Board and the State Higher Education Labor Relations Board - Election and Certification of Exclusive RepresentativesSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0692Baltimore City - Demolition Program FundingSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0993
    (HB0343)
Procurement - Equal Pay Certificates - RequirementSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.