Vandalism

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0202Criminal Law - Malicious Destruction of Property - Transit VehiclesDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0737Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Property by Graffiti - PenaltiesDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0742 / CH0386
    (SB0991)
Criminal Procedure - Citation AuthorityDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 386Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1150Prince George's County - Food Service Facilities - Letter Grading PG 313-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1217Food Service Facilities - Letter GradingDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0991
    (HB0742 / CH0386)
Criminal Procedure - Citation AuthoritySenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.