Vandalism

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0408
    (SB0477)
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - CitationDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0803
    (SB0900)
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of AbuseDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1272Prince George's County - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse PG 314-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1334 / CH0761State Highway Administration - Traffic Control Devices - Decorative TreatmentsDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 761Environment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0477
    (HB0408)
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - CitationSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0900
    (HB0803)
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of AbuseSenator PetersIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:18 P.M.