Vending Machines

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0085Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Requirements and RecordsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0278Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum AgeDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0338Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Operators and Required RecordsDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0347
    (SB0365)
Sales and Use Tax - Rate ReductionDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0918
    (SB0382 / CH0161)
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required RecordsDelegate CostaVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1273
    (SB0986)
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors ProhibitedDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0325Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum AgeSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0365
    (HB0347)
Sales and Use Tax - Rate ReductionSenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0382 / CH0161
    (HB0918)
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required RecordsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 161Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0394Statewide Container Recycling Refund ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment (M3)
SB0986
    (HB1273)
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors ProhibitedSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:36 P.M.