Vending Machines

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0108
    (SB0037)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0679Primary and Secondary Education - Health and Safety - Chemical-Free Schools ActDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0964Sales and Use Tax - Snack Food - ApplicationDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0982
    (SB0684)
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction ProgramDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1095
    (SB0504)
Public Schools - Nutrition Standards - Vending Machines and MarketingDelegate SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0037
    (HB0108)
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland InitiativeSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0504
    (HB1095)
Public Schools - Nutrition Standards - Vending Machines and MarketingSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0684
    (HB0982)
Maryland Redeemable Beverage Container and Litter Reduction ProgramSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Referred to interim study by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.