Veterans Affairs, Department of

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0274Veterans - Availability and Accessibility of Health Care Services and Transportation - StudyDelegate QueenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0275 / CH0183Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Recommended Courses in Military CultureDelegate QueenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 183Health and Government Operations
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1275 / CH0706
    (SB0857 / CH0707)
State Government - Department of Veterans Affairs - Veterans' Services SpecialistsDelegate VogtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 706Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0441 / CH0416Veterans Affairs - Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - EstablishmentSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 416Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0857 / CH0707
    (HB1275 / CH0706)
State Government - Department of Veterans Affairs - Veterans' Services SpecialistsSenator SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 707Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1084 / CH0709
    (HB0587 / CH0708)
State Finance and Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Definitions and PenaltiesSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 709Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:44 A.M.