Veterinarians

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0178Criminal Law - Dangerous Dogs - Registration and PenaltiesDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0767 / CH0562
    (SB0820 / CH0561)
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - EstablishmentDelegate FrushApproved by the Governor - Chapter 562Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
SB0820 / CH0561
    (HB0767 / CH0562)
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - EstablishmentSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 561Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.