Veterinarians

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0216 / CH0412
    (SB0269 / CH0411)
Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From LiabilityDelegate LamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 412Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0432
    (SB0366)
Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for LicensingDelegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0481
    (SB0578)
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and CostsDelegate TurnerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansHorse Racing (C6)
HB0602 / CH0787
    (SB0422 / CH0788)
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017Delegate RobinsonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 787Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0626 / CH0409Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Standards of Care and Protocol Implementation and EnforcementDelegate GilchristApproved by the Governor - Chapter 409Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1243Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services for Adopted Government Service DogsDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1463 / CH0417Veterinary Practitioners - Animal Cruelty and Animal Fighting - ReportingDelegate FrushApproved by the Governor - Chapter 417Environment and Transportation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0269 / CH0411
    (HB0216 / CH0412)
Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From LiabilitySenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 411Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0366
    (HB0432)
Public Health - Rabies Vaccination Information - Submission to Local Agencies and Use for LicensingSenator MadalenoIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0422 / CH0788
    (HB0602 / CH0787)
Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017Senator PinskyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 788Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0578
    (HB0481)
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and CostsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceHorse Racing (C6)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:49 A.M.