Veterinarians

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0421
    (SB0463)
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and CostsDelegate TurnerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansHorse Racing (C6)
HB1564Income Tax Credit - Veterinary ServicesDelegate GlassIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1662 / CH0237Business Regulation – Retail Pet StoresDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 237Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0238Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Pet ExpensesSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0463
    (HB0421)
State Racing Commission - Equine Medical Director - Employment and CostsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing canceledFinanceHorse Racing (C6)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 30, 2018 3:59 P.M.