Victims

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0057 / CH0606
    (SB0355 / CH0239)
Office of Health Care Quality - Abuser Registry WorkgroupDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0250 / CH0363Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Remedy and Priority of RestitutionDelegate SmigielApproved by the Governor - Chapter 363Judiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0295
    (SB0276 / CH0156)
Death Penalty Repeal and Appropriation from Savings to Aid Survivors of Homicide VictimsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/14/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0461
    (SB0558)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Domestic Violence Center Ho. Co. 6-13Howard County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0588
    (SB0473 / CH0474)
Baltimore City - Children - Records AccessDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0713 / CH0636Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human TraffickingDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0735
    (SB0698)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0866Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze AssetsDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0892
    (SB0731)
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional ReliefDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0921 / CH0652
    (SB0258)
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of CrimeDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 652Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0942 / CH0301
    (SB0624 / CH0300)
Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care RecordsDelegate LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 301Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1056Police Training - Human Trafficking - Sensitivity and AwarenessDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1125
    (SB0388)
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - ChildrenDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1188
    (SB0215)
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21Delegate ValderramaIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1230
    (SB0490)
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief and Orders to Vacate HomeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1382Sentencing Procedures - Statement by Victim or Victim's Representative (Alex's Law)Delegate McDermottIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1427State Government - Human Trafficking Address Confidentiality ProgramDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0215
    (HB1188)
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Victims Under Age 21Senator ForehandIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0258
    (HB0921 / CH0652)
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of CrimeSenator ShankVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0276 / CH0156
    (HB0295)
Death Penalty Repeal - Substitution of Life Without the Possibility of ParolePresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 156Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 12:30 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0355 / CH0239
    (HB0057 / CH0606)
Office of Health Care Quality - Abuser Registry WorkgroupSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 239Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0388
    (HB1125)
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - ChildrenSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0473 / CH0474
    (HB0588)
Baltimore City - Children - Records AccessSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0490
    (HB1230)
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for ReliefSenator ShankIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0558
    (HB0461)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Domestic Violence CenterHoward County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0624 / CH0300
    (HB0942 / CH0301)
Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care RecordsSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 300Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0698
    (HB0735)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0731
    (HB0892)
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional ReliefSenator ForehandIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0818Community Juvenile Services ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.