Video

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0166Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Daily Calibration and Video RecordingsDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0246Juvenile Law - Placement Visits - Video ConferencingChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0251
    (SB0785)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RepealDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0269Public Schools - Requirements for Controlled AccessDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Ways and Means
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0420 / CH0113Vehicle Laws - Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of TollsChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0421Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control SystemsDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0759Vehicle Laws - Distracted Driving - ProhibitionDelegate MaloneIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0825Public Service Commission - Hearings and Proceedings - Video and Audio RecordingsDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1103Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Expansion and ModificationsDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1436
    (SB0967)
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras RequiredDelegate SwainIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1465Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - WarningDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0207Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control SystemsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Special Order until 11:30 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0768
    (HB0912)
Organ Donation Driver Education Act of 2013Senator RaskinIn the House - Favorable Report by Environmental MattersJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0785
    (HB0251)
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - RepealSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0967
    (HB1436)
Business Regulation - Retail Service Stations - Video Cameras RequiredSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1048Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Refund of Civil PenaltiesSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.