Violence

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0189Courts - Peace Orders - Acts Committed Against EmployeesSenator FeldmanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0211Public Safety - Handgun Permits - QualificationsDelegate VitaleIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0294
    (SB0281 / CH0427)
Firearm Safety Act of 2013SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0424
    (SB0786)
Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea AgreementsDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0477Firearms - Conviction for Crime of Violence - Probation Before JudgmentDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0478
    (SB0861)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0542
    (SB0360 / CH0044)
Criminal Law - Aggravated Animal Cruelty - BaitingDelegate McConkeyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0588
    (SB0473 / CH0474)
Baltimore City - Children - Records AccessDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0594
    (SB0628)
Crimes Against Public Administration - Tampering with EvidenceDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0774
    (SB0804)
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Violence Prevention ProgramDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0810Mental Health Professionals - Duty to Report Risk of Serious Harm - Firearm SafetyDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0930Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - ProhibitionsDelegate LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0969Commission to Consider Mental Health-Related Ways to Limit Mass Violence by Individuals with Antisocial Personality Disorders, Depressive Disorders, or Other Mental IllnessDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0972
    (SB0567)
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - ProhibitionsDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1112
    (SB0556)
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - ReleaseDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1250
    (SB0988)
Crimes - Threat of Mass ViolenceDelegate ValderramaIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HJ0002Ongoing Conflict in the Democratic Republic of the CongoDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0281 / CH0427
    (HB0294)
Firearm Safety Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB0360 / CH0044
    (HB0542)
Criminal Law - Aggravated Animal Cruelty - BaitingSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 44Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0473 / CH0474
    (HB0588)
Baltimore City - Children - Records AccessSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 474Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0556
    (HB1112)
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - ReleaseSenator StoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0567
    (HB0972)
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - ProhibitionsSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0628
    (HB0594)
Crimes Against Public Administration - Tampering with EvidenceSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0786
    (HB0424)
Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea AgreementsSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0804
    (HB0774)
Labor and Employment - Health Care Facilities - Workplace Violence Prevention ProgramSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0861
    (HB0478)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0988
    (HB1250)
Crimes - Threat of Mass ViolenceSenator MuseIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 3:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/8/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1058Education - The Reasonable School Discipline Act of 2013Senator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1069Criminal Procedure - Issuance of Summonses and Arrest Warrants and Restrictions on Pretrial ReleaseSenator ShankIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:44 A.M.