Violence

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0374
    (SB0603 / CH0567)
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior CrimesDelegate AndersonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0475Courts - Grand Juries - Prohibited ActionDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0585Public Safety - Police Training Commission - Policies and Reporting RequirementsDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0703Public Safety - Firearms Disqualifications - Antique FirearmDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0760Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - AlterationsDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0847Criminal Procedure - Crime of Violence - DefinitionDelegate ReyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0876Public Safety - District Court Commissioner - Complaints of Police BrutalityDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0911Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsDelegate AtterbearyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0921Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel - Training RequirementDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1001
    (SB0943)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferDelegate SmithIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1016 / CH0519Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - RecommendationsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 519Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1091
    (SB0437)
Criminal Law - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Repeal of Residence RequirementDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1262
    (SB0829)
Baltimore City - Civilian Review BoardDelegate OaksIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1268 / CH0506Calvert County - Pretrial Release Program - Nonviolent FelonCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 506Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1305Criminal Procedure - Crimes of Violence Involving Firearms - Diminution Credits, Parole, and Plea AgreementsDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1312
    (SB1005 / CH0515)
Justice Reinvestment ActSpeakerIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1564
    (SB0486)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - A Penn-North Initiative Youth Violence Prevention CenterDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1601Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement OfficerDelegate ClusterIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0437
    (HB1091)
Criminal Law - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Repeal of Residence RequirementSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0486
    (HB1564)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - A Penn-North Initiative Youth Violence Prevention CenterSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0508 / CH0679
    (HB0190)
Civil Remedies for Shoplifting and Employee TheftSenator RamirezEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0603 / CH0567
    (HB0374)
Criminal Law - Pretrial Release - Prior CrimesSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 567Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0829
    (HB1262)
Baltimore City - Civilian Review BoardSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0943
    (HB1001)
Criminal Procedure - Firearms - TransferSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0965
    (HB1264)
Criminal Procedure - Right of Appeal - Unlawful Possession of Regulated Firearm, Rifle, or ShotgunSenator McFaddenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1005 / CH0515
    (HB1312)
Justice Reinvestment ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
SB1026Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - RecommendationsPresidentIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.