Violence

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0318
    (SB0467)
Public Safety - Firearms Disqualifications - Antique FirearmDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0359Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Mental InjuryDelegate AngelIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0484
    (SB0861)
Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsDelegate AtterbearyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB0608
    (SB1011)
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend PropertyDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0906Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Home InvasionDelegate MaloneIn the House - Returned PassedJudiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1220Prince George's County - Commission of Crime of Violence in Presence of Minor PG 313-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1503Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - ReportsDelegate HaynesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/2/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1521Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Commission to Study Firearm Violence - EstablishmentDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1661
    (SB1191)
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or AttacksDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0467
    (HB0318)
Public Safety - Firearms Disqualifications - Antique FirearmSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0524Criminal Law - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Repeal of Residence RequirementSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0561Public Safety - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - IneligibilitySenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0706Landlord and Tenant - Expedited Eviction Proceedings - Notice and AppealsSenator NormanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
SB0861
    (HB0484)
Family Law - Marriage - Age RequirementsSenator SmithIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1011
    (HB0608)
Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend PropertySenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1191
    (HB1661)
Schools and Child Care Centers - State Grant Program - Security Upgrades for Facilities at Risk of Hate Crimes or AttacksSenator MannoIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)

April 13, 2017 4:02 P.M.