Violence

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0023Baltimore County - Public Schools - Active Assailant Event Training and DrillsDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0100
    (SB0199)
Criminal Law - Violent Offenders - Penalties (Accountability for Violent Criminals Act of 2018)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0346
    (SB0297)
Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Human TraffickingSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0402
    (SB0448)
Public Safety – Firearms Disqualifications – Antique Firearm (Shadé’s Law)Delegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0404Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Human TraffickingDelegate ChangIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0432
    (SB0545)
Public Safety – Grant Programs and Funding (Public Safety and Violence Prevention Act of 2018)Delegate LiermanIn the House - Passed EnrolledAppropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0488Criminal Law - Third-Degree AssaultDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0494
    (SB0555)
Safe Neighborhoods ActDelegate BeidleIn the Senate - Third Reading Failed (20-22)Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0890Correctional Services - Parole Eligibility - Violent Crime Involving a FirearmDelegate MaloneIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0963Correctional Services - Eligibility for Parole - Violent CrimeDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1173Public Safety - Use of Force De-Escalation Training of Law Enforcement Officers - ReportsDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1309Criminal Law - Crimes Against Property - Right to Defend PropertyDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1379Baltimore County Public Schools - Student Misconduct - Penalty for Parent or GuardianDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1382Public Schools - Student Misconduct - Parent or Guardian LiabilityDelegate LongIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1397Criminal Procedure – Pretrial Release – Defendant on ParoleDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1529
    (SB1100)
Criminal Law - Assault - Sentencing (Violence Prevention Education Act)Delegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1731Public Safety - Student Peer Mediation Program Fund - EstablishmentDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1807
    (SB1250)
Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence and Deadly Weapons on Public School PropertyDelegate SydnorIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0101Criminal Law – Crimes of Violence, Expungement, and Drug TreatmentSenator NormanIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0199
    (HB0100)
Criminal Law - Violent Offenders - Penalties (Accountability for Violent Criminals Act of 2018)PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0297
    (HB0346)
Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Human TraffickingPresidentIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0448
    (HB0402)
Public Safety - Firearms Disqualifications - Antique Firearm (Shadé's Law)Senator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0545
    (HB0432)
Public Safety - Maryland Violence Intervention and Prevention Program Fund - EstablishmentSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0555
    (HB0494)
Safe Neighborhoods ActSenator HoughIn the House - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB1100
    (HB1529)
Criminal Law - Assault - Sentencing (Violence Prevention Education Act)Senator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1250
    (HB1807)
Criminal Law – Threat of Mass ViolenceSenator LeeIn the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1263Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)Senator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Safety (E4)
SB1265 / CH0030Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018Senator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 19, 2018 8:21 A.M.