Vital Records

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0022
    (SB0165)
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion ServicesDelegate Nathan-PulliamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0529 / CH0376
    (SB0463)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising MorticiansDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 376Health and Government Operations
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0723 / CH0274
    (SB0460 / CH0273)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to PracticeDelegate TarrantApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0857 / CH0644Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived ChildDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 644Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1029
    (SB0783)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsDelegate OaksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1099
    (SB0792)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1202Health Occupations - Certified Professional Midwives - Pilot ProgramDelegate Kelly, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1471Health - Statistics and Records - Electronic Filing of Death CertificatesDelegate MyersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0165
    (HB0022)
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion ServicesSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
SB0178Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of PaternityChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0460 / CH0273
    (HB0723 / CH0274)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to PracticeSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0463
    (HB0529 / CH0376)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Apprentice Sponsors, Funeral Establishment Licenses, and Supervising MorticiansSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0783
    (HB1029)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0792
    (HB1099)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.