Vital Records

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0280 / CH0453
    (SB0931 / CH0452)
Birth Certificates - Homeless Individuals - Prohibition on Collection of FeeDelegate MoonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 453Health and Government Operations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0404
    (SB0418)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActDelegate PendergrassIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Health (J1)
HB0459 / CH0316
    (SB0389)
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee ReductionSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0968Family Law - Collaborative Reproduction - Orders of ParentageDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1099Vital Records - New Certificates of Birth - Gender IdentityDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1390Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of CitizenshipDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0389
    (HB0459 / CH0316)
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee ReductionPresidentIn the House - Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
Appropriations
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0418
    (HB0404)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0931 / CH0452
    (HB0280 / CH0453)
Birth Certificates - Homeless Individuals - Prohibition on Collection of FeeSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 452Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1096Child Abuse and Neglect - Information Regarding Parents Responsible for Child Abuse or NeglectSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.