Vocational Rehabilitation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0048 / CH0605
    (SB1066 / CH0343)
Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit EntitiesDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0516Office of Legislative Audits - Fiscal/Compliance Audits - Blind Industries and Services of MarylandDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0841
    (SB0638)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - St. Luke's House Renovation ProjectDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0992Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - St. Mary's County - Pathway's Facility RenovationDelegate BohananIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
HB1023Public Ethics - Blind Industries and Services of MarylandDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
SB0638
    (HB0841)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - St. Luke's House Renovation ProjectSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB1066 / CH0343
    (HB0048 / CH0605)
Minority Business Enterprises - Not-for-Profit EntitiesSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 343Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.