Volunteers

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0246 / CH0576
    (SB0716 / CH0575)
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil CountyCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 576Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0358 / CH0077
    (SB0629 / CH0076)
Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records CheckDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 77Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0468
    (SB0097 / CH0348)
Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach ProgramsDelegate LamIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPublic Health (J1)
HB0480
    (SB0180)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Arundel Volunteer Fire Department Community CenterDelegate SaabIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0501 / CH0488Motor Vehicle Insurance - Volunteer DriversDelegate ChangApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Economic Matters
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0685Department of Aging - Comprehensive Plan for the Aging PopulationDelegate KrimmIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
HB0764
    (SB0521)
Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesGaming (C7)
HB1126Prince George's County Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Diversion Programs Task Force PG 307-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1212Public Health - Overdose and Infectious Disease Prevention Safer Drug Use Facility ProgramDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1296Public Safety - Police Training Commission - Community Service RequirementDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1384Baltimore City - Registration of Volunteer Rescue SquadsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1488 / CH0654
    (SB0909)
Service, Stipends, and Scholarships - Maryland Corps Program - EstablishedDelegate HettlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 654Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
Higher Education (F2)
HB1541Higher Education - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Personnel - Partial Tuition WaiverAllegany County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHigher Education (F2)
HB1609
    (SB0251)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Arbutus Volunteer Fire DepartmentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0097 / CH0348
    (HB0468)
Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach ProgramsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 348Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0180
    (HB0480)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Arundel Volunteer Fire Department Community CenterSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0251
    (HB1609)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Arbutus Volunteer Fire DepartmentSenator KasemeyerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0521
    (HB0764)
Anne Arundel County - Charitable GamingAnne Arundel County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0629 / CH0076
    (HB0358 / CH0077)
Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records CheckSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 76Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0635Vehicle Laws - Flashing Lights - Community-Based Emergency Response VehiclesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0716 / CH0575
    (HB0246 / CH0576)
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil CountyCecil County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 575Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0719Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fees - MunicipalitiesSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0909
    (HB1488 / CH0654)
Service, Stipends, and Scholarships - Maryland Corps Program - EstablishedSenator FergusonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1050Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Accokeek Volunteer Fire DepartmentSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1109 / CH0468Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Transfer of Senior Community Service Employment ProgramChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 468Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.