Volunteers

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0224 / CH0826Higher Education - AmeriCorps Program Participants - In-State TuitionDelegate LiermanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 826Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0301
    (SB0482)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - White Marsh Volunteer Fire CompanyDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0601 / CH0673
    (SB0248)
Senior Call-Check Service and Notification Program - EstablishmentDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 673Economic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0822 / CH0155Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliaries and Reserve VolunteersDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 155Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0979 / CH0686Property Tax Credit - Public Safety OfficersDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 686Ways and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1084
    (SB1104)
Income Tax Credit - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services PersonnelDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1195High School Graduation Requirements - Student Service - Fire Fighting Training and Volunteer HoursDelegate AdamsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1267Workers' Compensation - Members of Volunteer Company - Computation of Average Weekly WageDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1646
    (SB1078)
Creation of a State Debt - Lutheran Mission Society Compassion CentersDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0070 / CH0262Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Youth Sports WorkersSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Finance
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0258Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Police Auxiliaries or Reserve VolunteersSenator AstleIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2017 - 2:20 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0482
    (HB0301)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - White Marsh Volunteer Fire CompanySenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1104
    (HB1084)
Income Tax Credit - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services PersonnelSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB1130Health Insurance - Volunteer Emergency Responders - Benefits Under Blanket Policies and ContractsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceInsurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:53 A.M.