Warrants

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0408
    (SB0477)
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - CitationDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0739 / CH0802
    (SB0941 / CH0803)
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - StandardsDelegate MoonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1362
    (SB0835)
Criminal Procedure - Immigration - Community TrustDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1375 / CH0486
    (SB0781 / CH0485)
Criminal Procedure - Testing - HIV and Hepatitis CDelegate ProctorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Judiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1407Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Full NamesDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1526 / CH0622
    (SB0934)
Criminal Procedure - Postsentencing - Victim NotificationDelegate AngelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 622Judiciary
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0477
    (HB0408)
Criminal Procedure - Charging Procedures and Documents - CitationSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0781 / CH0485
    (HB1375 / CH0486)
Criminal Procedure - Testing - HIV and Hepatitis CSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0835
    (HB1362)
Maryland Law Enforcement and Governmental Trust ActSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0934
    (HB1526 / CH0622)
Criminal Procedure - Postsentencing - Victim NotificationSenator SmithIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0941 / CH0803
    (HB0739 / CH0802)
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - StandardsSenator SmithEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.