Warranties

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB1139
    (SB0886)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with DealersDelegate FrushIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1141Condominiums - Warranty ClaimsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1215 / CH0408Consumer Protection - Home Appliances and Warranty Enforcement - StudyDelegate WalkerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 408Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0167Residential Condominiums - Governing Documents - Claims ProvisionsSenator KelleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0886
    (HB1139)
Vehicle Laws - Manufacturers, Distributors, and Factory Branches - Relationship with DealersSenator StoneIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.