Washington County

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0253
    (SB0535 / CH0495)
Washington County - Amusement Devices - Tip JarsWashington County DelegationIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedWays and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0546
    (SB0508 / CH0060)
Washington County - Public Facilities BondsWashington County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
HB0551 / CH0489
    (SB0506 / CH0488)
Washington County - Technology-Related Businesses - Payment in Lieu of Taxes AgreementsWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0559 / CH0048
    (SB0408 / CH0047)
Washington County - Special Deputy SheriffsWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0720 / CH0558
    (SB0814 / CH0557)
Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense ProvisionsWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 558Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0792 / CH0059
    (SB0507 / CH0058)
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child SupportWashington County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 59Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1060Washington County - Polling Places - Electioneering BoundariesWashington County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansElections (G1)
HB1366Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store LicensesDelegate BarnesIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1450Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Antietam Fire Company RenovationsDelegate DonoghueIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1451Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Municipal Electric Light Plant ProjectDelegate DonoghueIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1511
    (SB1042)
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - DecisionsWashington County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0299Creation of a State Debt - Washington County - Lockhouse 44, Lock 44, and Western MD Railroad Lift BridgeSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0408 / CH0047
    (HB0559 / CH0048)
Washington County - Special Deputy SheriffsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 47Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0506 / CH0488
    (HB0551 / CH0489)
Washington County - Technology-Related Businesses - Payment in Lieu of Taxes AgreementsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0507 / CH0058
    (HB0792 / CH0059)
Correctional Facilities - Inmate Programs in Washington County - Payment of Child SupportSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0508 / CH0060
    (HB0546)
Washington County - Public Facilities BondsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 60Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0535 / CH0495
    (HB0253)
Washington County - Amusement Devices - Tip JarsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 495Budget and Taxation
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0789Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise ParticipationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0814 / CH0557
    (HB0720 / CH0558)
Washington County - Salary Study Commission - Updating Salary and Expense ProvisionsSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 557Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB1042
    (HB1511)
Washington County Building Code Board of Appeals - DecisionsSenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.