Water

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 30

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0057General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Watermen's DayDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0125 / CH0377Environment - Emergency Action Plans for DamsChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 377Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0228
    (SB0546)
Environment - Water Service - Shutoff Notice Disclosures and Vulnerable Population ProtectionDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0270 / CH0386Environment - Testing for Lead in Drinking Water - Public and Nonpublic SchoolsDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 386Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0320Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0336Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Rates MC/PG 101-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0358Baltimore City - Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Service Charges - Qualified Residential CustomersDelegate ConawayIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0417 / CH0366
    (SB0314 / CH0367)
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0453Tax Sales - Water Liens - MoratoriumDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0466
    (SB0870)
Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - ApplicationDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0477 / CH0404
    (SB0396 / CH0405)
Natural Resources - Protection and Restoration of State-Owned LakesDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 404Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0511 / CH0535
    (SB0218 / CH0536)
Public Utilities - Water Companies and Sewage Disposal Companies - Rate Cases and ProceedingsDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 535Economic Matters
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0557 / CH0371
    (SB0440 / CH0370)
Environment - Water Management - Sediment Control at Large Redevelopment SitesDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 371Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0572 / CH0137Howard County - Property Tax Credit for Commercial Real Property - Flood Damage Ho. Co. 9-17Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0779
    (SB0719)
Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017Delegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0901
    (SB1044)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Interfaith Watershed Restoration and Outreach ProjectDelegate FrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0918Environment - Water Services - Water Affordability ProgramDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1168 / CH0618
    (SB0957 / CH0619)
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank AuthoritiesDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 618Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Counties - Generally (L1)
SB0218 / CH0536
    (HB0511 / CH0535)
Public Utilities - Water Companies and Sewage Disposal Companies - Rate Cases and ProceedingsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 536Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0262 / CH0215
    (HB0771 / CH0216)
Public Health - Mobile Food Service Facilities - Licensing and Inspection by County Health DepartmentsSenator BatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 215Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0314 / CH0367
    (HB0417 / CH0366)
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 367Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0396 / CH0405
    (HB0477 / CH0404)
Natural Resources - Protection and Restoration of State-Owned LakesSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 405Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0440 / CH0370
    (HB0557 / CH0371)
Environment - Water Management - Sediment Control at Large Redevelopment SitesSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0546
    (HB0228)
Environment - Water Service - Shutoff Notice Disclosures and Vulnerable Population ProtectionSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0719
    (HB0779)
Conserving Working Waterfront Farms Act of 2017Senator EckardtIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0870
    (HB0466)
Prevailing Wage - Tax Increment Financing Developments - ApplicationSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0957 / CH0619
    (HB1168 / CH0618)
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank AuthoritiesSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 619Budget and Taxation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and TransportationCounties - Generally (L1)
SB1040 / CH0387Environment - Water and Sewer and Solid Waste Management Plan ApprovalSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 387Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1044
    (HB0901)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Interfaith Watershed Restoration and Outreach ProjectSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1190 / CH0397Bay Restoration Fund - Upgraded Wastewater Facilities - Grants to Counties and MunicipalitiesSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 397Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/7/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:18 P.M.