Weapons

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0050Public Safety - Use of Electronic Control Devices - ReportsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0181Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Guidelines for Use of Electronic Control DevicesDelegate AndersonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0313 / CH0443Montgomery County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone MC 10-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 443Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0739 / CH0802
    (SB0941 / CH0803)
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - StandardsDelegate MoonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0941 / CH0803
    (HB0739 / CH0802)
Public Safety - SWAT Teams - StandardsSenator SmithEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 803Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0946Gun-Free Higher Education ZonesSenator SmithIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:57 A.M.