Weapons

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0920
    (SB0705)
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - ReportsDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1302 / CH0250Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective OrdersDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1338
    (SB0817)
Natural Resources - Hunting - SundaysDelegate AndertonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1429Natural Resources - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1831Baltimore County Public Schools - Student Misconduct Offenses Relating to Weapons - ReportDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1832Education - Public Schools - Threat Assessment ReportDelegate Howard, S.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HJ0012Presidential Authority Over the Use of Nuclear WeaponsDelegate QueenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations
3/5/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0705
    (HB0920)
Public Safety - SWAT Team Activation and Deployment - ReportsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0817
    (HB1338)
Natural Resources - Hunting - SundaysSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 27, 2018 1:04 P.M.