Weights and Measures

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0179Vehicle Laws - Chesapeake Bay Commemorative Registration Plates - Truck EligibilityDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0459 / CH0316
    (SB0389)
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee ReductionSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0486Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural ProductsDelegate ReillyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0698
    (SB0573)
Motor Vehicles - Gross Weight and Axle Load - PoultryDelegate OttoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0791 / CH0120
    (SB0746)
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting LicenseCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 120Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0821Energy Storage Portfolio Standard (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act)Delegate KormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0843 / CH0127
    (SB0695)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon LicenseFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 127Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0925
    (SB0959)
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery LicenseDelegate JacobsIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1013 / CH0036
    (SB0908)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016Delegate BeidleGubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1071 / CH0455
    (SB0958 / CH0454)
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - LicensesCecil County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 455Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1106
    (SB0921)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsDelegate FrickVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1117Environment - Mattress Stewardship ProgramDelegate HillIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB1337 / CH0310Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor - Manufacturer's and Wholesaler's Licenses and PermitsDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 310Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1496Farmers' Rights ActDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1627Vehicle Laws - Class G (Trailer) Vehicles - Permanent RegistrationDelegate GlassIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0389
    (HB0459 / CH0316)
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee ReductionPresidentIn the House - Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
Appropriations
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0573
    (HB0698)
Task Force to Study the Impact of Hauling Grain, Poultry, and Dairy on State HighwaysSenator MathiasIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0630 / CH0418Comptroller - Distillery Off-Site Permit and Liquor Festival PermitSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 418Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0695
    (HB0843 / CH0127)
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon LicenseSenator YoungVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0746
    (HB0791 / CH0120)
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting LicenseSenator ReadyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0761Farmers' Rights ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0958 / CH0454
    (HB1071 / CH0455)
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - LicensesCecil County SenatorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 454Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0959
    (HB0925)
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery LicenseSenator HersheyIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1127Business Regulation - Retail Service Station Dealers - Required SignsSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.