Weights and Measures

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0042 / CH0314Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery LicensesDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 314Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0179 / CH0493
    (SB0209)
Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - BarbershopsFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 493Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0252 / CH0315Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor and WineDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 315Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0289
    (SB0479)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace LicenseDelegate HayesIn the House - Returned PassedEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0296Alcoholic Beverages - Warehouse Shopping Clubs - Beer or Wine LicensesDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0306 / CH0127Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting at Dispensaries MC 19-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 127Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0522 / CH0035
    (SB0427 / CH0034)
Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)Delegate BarronApproved by the Governor - Chapter 35Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0600
    (SB0175)
Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame RestrictionsDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0768
    (SB0917 / CH0353)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling PermitDelegate OttoIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0797 / CH0140Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Thresholds for Tasting Ho. Co. 19-17Howard County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 140Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1000Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural ProductsDelegate ReillyIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1159
    (SB0814)
Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage UnitsDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1283Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery LicenseDelegate BranchIn the House - Passed EnrolledEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1296Vehicle Laws - Class G (Trailer) Vehicles - Permanent RegistrationDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1328Alcoholic Beverages - Class 1 Distillery Licenses - Samples and Sales of ProductDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1391
    (SB0801)
Baltimore County - Class 5 BreweryDelegate BrooksIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1420Alcoholic Beverages - Modern Brewery LicenseDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1479
    (SB1050)
Motor Vehicles - Dump Trucks - Gross Vehicle Weight LimitsDelegate ReillyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1555Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - ServiceDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0175
    (HB0600)
Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame RestrictionsSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0209
    (HB0179 / CH0493)
Frederick County - Beer and Wine Licenses - BarbershopsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0275Alcoholic Beverages - Wine Village PermitSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0281 / CH0316Alcoholic Beverages - Definition of Beer - Hard CiderSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0427 / CH0034
    (HB0522 / CH0035)
Maryland Institute for Emergency Medical Services Systems - Automated External Defibrillators - Study (The Joe Sheya Act)Senator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 34Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0479
    (HB0289)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace LicenseSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0801
    (HB1391)
Baltimore County - Class 5 BrewerySenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0814
    (HB1159)
Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage UnitsSenator RosapepeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0847Retail Service Station Dealers - Gas Prices - Required SignageSenator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0917 / CH0353
    (HB0768)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling PermitSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 353Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB1050
    (HB1479)
Motor Vehicles - Dump Trucks - Gross Vehicle Weight LimitsSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB1102 / CH0564Worcester County - Ocean City Convention Center - Beer and Wine Tasting LicenseSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 564Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 2:51 P.M.