Weights and Measures

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0019Solar Energy Grant Program - Minimum Grant AmountsDelegate BrooksIn the House - Hearing canceledEconomic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0046Motor Vehicles - Farm Equipment - Wide- or Oversize-Load SignalsDelegate FoldenIn the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0144Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Country Club Off-Sale Permit MC 10-18Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0153Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dispensaries in Retail Grocery Stores MC 16-18Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing canceledEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0171Montgomery County - Beer and Wine Licenses - Shochu and Soju MC 20-18Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0253Motor Vehicles - Automobile TransportersChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0351
    (SB0301)
Protect Our Students Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0518Alcoholic Beverages - Reform on Tap Act of 2018Chair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0548
    (SB1073)
Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - ApplicationDelegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0646
    (SB1069)
Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural ProductsDelegate ReillyIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0794
    (SB0692)
Public Service Commission - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - LocationDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0934
    (SB0557)
Public Utilities - Electric Generating Systems - Net Metering and Community Solar EnergyDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1052Alcoholic Beverages - Class 5 Brewery License - AlterationsDelegate BranchIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1122
    (SB0959)
Natural Resources - Hunting - Black BearsDelegate McKayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1135
    (SB1058)
Renewable Energy - Offshore Wind Projects - Distance RequirementsDelegate AdamsIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1137Natural Resources - Fisheries - Commercial Oyster DiversDelegate JacobsIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1156
    (SB0340)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting LicensesDelegate McKayIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1174Natural Resources - Oysters - Tolerance for Seafood DealersDelegate JacobsIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1369
    (SB0867)
Alcoholic Beverages - Breweries - Limits on Production and On-Premises SalesDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1558Pharmacists - Dispensing of Prescription Drugs - Single Dispensing of Dosage UnitsDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1705Health - Job-Related Drug Testing - Breath Tests for AlcoholDelegate McConkeyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
SB0023Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Farmers' Markets and Other EventsSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0218Alcoholic Beverages - Retail Wine Sellers - Shochu and SojuSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0301
    (HB0351)
Protect Our Students Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2018 - 12:45 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0340
    (HB1156)
Washington County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tasting LicensesWashington County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0496Environment - Greywater - Residential UseSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0557
    (HB0934)
Public Utilities - Electric Generating Systems - Net Metering and Community Solar EnergySenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0692
    (HB0794)
Public Service Commission - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - LocationSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0867
    (HB1369)
Alcoholic Beverages – Breweries – Limits on Production and On–Premises SalesSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0959
    (HB1122)
Natural Resources - Hunting - Black BearsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB1058
    (HB1135)
Renewable Energy – Offshore Wind Projects – Distance RequirementsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB1069
    (HB0646)
Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural ProductsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB1073
    (HB0548)
Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - ApplicationSenator PinskyIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesUtility Regulation (C5)

February 16, 2018 3:44 P.M.