Welfare

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0214Prince George's County - Equality in Education Act PG 505-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0580
    (SB0250)
Landlord and Tenant - Prohibited Lease Provisions - Late Fees for Tenants Receiving Government BenefitsDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0933Housing and Community Development - Rental Allowance Program - EligibilityDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0941 / CH0396Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – EligibilityDelegate QueenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1235
    (SB0818 / CH0562)
Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Eligibility and Annual AppropriationDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1468 / CH0793Transit - Job Access and Reverse Commute (JARC) ProgramDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 793Environment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1615 / CH0408
    (SB1231)
Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance ProgramDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 408Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1729
    (SB1164)
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - FundingDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1765 / CH0585On–Site Sewage Disposal Systems – Watershed Implementation Plan and Bay Restoration Fund Disbursements and Financial AssistanceDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 585Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0818 / CH0562
    (HB1235)
Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Eligibility and Annual AppropriationSenator MadalenoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 562Budget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1001 / CH0596Employee Benefits – State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program and Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings ProgramSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 596Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1034Human Services – State Public Assistance Eligibility – Arrest WarrantSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB1164
    (HB1729)
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - FundingSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:44 A.M.