Wells

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0394Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and FundDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1112Environment - Gas Storage Wells and Facilities - Safety RegulationsDelegate PlattIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1307
    (SB1010)
Environment - Municipal Water Supply Contamination - Remediation CostsDelegate JacobsIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0361Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability ActSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1010
    (HB1307)
Environment - Municipal Water Supply Contamination - Remediation CostsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.