Wicomico County

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0204Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - FundingDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0672
    (SB0920)
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Lower Shore Clinic Day Program for Seniors with Disabilities FacilityDelegate Sample-HughesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0768
    (SB0917 / CH0353)
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling PermitDelegate OttoIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0894Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - SundaysWicomico County DelegationIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)Environment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0897
    (SB0684)
Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017SpeakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1111
    (SB0953)
Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms SeasonDelegate MautzIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0020Wicomico County - Vehicle Dealer's Licenses - Motor Home and Travel Trailer ShowsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0684
    (HB0897)
Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0920
    (HB0672)
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Lower Shore Clinic Day Program for Seniors with Disabilities FacilitySenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

November 28, 2017 1:18 P.M.