Witnesses

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0589Firearms Freedom ActDelegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0652
    (SB0817)
Criminal Law - Informants - Identity of MinorsDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0723 / CH0274
    (SB0460 / CH0273)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to PracticeDelegate TarrantApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0765
    (SB0959)
Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - TestimonyDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1037
    (SB0630)
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective OrderDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1103Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Expansion and ModificationsDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1112
    (SB0556)
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - ReleaseDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1304
    (SB0661)
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management and Peer SupportDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0043Courts - Evidence - Vehicle Repair EstimatesSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0460 / CH0273
    (HB0723 / CH0274)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to PracticeSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0556
    (HB1112)
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - ReleaseSenator StoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0630
    (HB1037)
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective OrderSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0661
    (HB1304)
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management and Peer SupportSenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0817
    (HB0652)
Criminal Law - Informants - Identity of MinorsSenator ShankIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0959
    (HB0765)
Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - TestimonySenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.