Women

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0102 / CH0425
    (SB0127)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0105Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Pregnancy Aid CenterDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0312 / CH0457
    (SB0334 / CH0456)
Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - NotificationDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 457Health and Government Operations
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0564
    (SB0498)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification and Credit - Creation of a Qualifying Business EnterpriseDelegate BranchIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
Economic Matters
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0723 / CH0274
    (SB0460 / CH0273)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to PracticeDelegate TarrantApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0744
    (SB0328)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Park Heights Women and Children's CenterDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0772
    (SB0399)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0804 / CH0548
    (SB0784 / CH0547)
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to PregnancyDelegate HuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 548Economic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsHuman Relations (D5)
HB0829Correctional Services - Pregnant Detainees and Inmates - Restraint RestrictionsDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0898
    (SB0455)
Public Health - Abortion Survey SystemDelegate KachIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1099
    (SB0792)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1202Health Occupations - Certified Professional Midwives - Pilot ProgramDelegate Kelly, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1299Lead Poisoning - Risk Reduction Standard - Frequency of TestingDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1312
    (SB0456)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1335Labor and Employment - Short-Term Disability Insurance for Pregnancy - RequirementDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1535
    (SB1067 / CH0603)
Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States ConstitutionDelegate JonesIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0114Health - Pregnant Women - Hepatitis B TestingSenator BensonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0127
    (HB0102 / CH0425)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0328
    (HB0744)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Park Heights Women and Children's CenterSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0334 / CH0456
    (HB0312 / CH0457)
Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - NotificationSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 456Finance
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0399
    (HB0772)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsSenator AstleIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0455
    (HB0898)
Public Health - Abortion Survey SystemSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0456
    (HB1312)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0460 / CH0273
    (HB0723 / CH0274)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to PracticeSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0498
    (HB0564)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification and Credit - Creation of a Qualifying Business EnterpriseSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0726Health - Medical Procedures - Ultrasound OptionsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0784 / CH0547
    (HB0804 / CH0548)
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to PregnancySenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 547Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersHuman Relations (D5)
SB0792
    (HB1099)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1067 / CH0603
    (HB1535)
Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States ConstitutionSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 603Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.