Women

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0011 / CH0326
    (SB0001 / CH0325)
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Use of Spouse's Sperm - ExceptionDelegate HillApproved by the Governor - Chapter 326Health and Government Operations
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0052Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization, Pregnancy, and Childbirth Services - Surrogate BenefitsDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0180 / CH0441
    (SB0856 / CH0440)
Public Health - HIV Testing During PregnancyDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 441Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Health (J1)
HB0300
    (SB1108)
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsDelegate FennellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0333Commission to Study the Employment of Ethnic Minorities and Women Under Procurement Contracts at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall AirportDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2016 - 12:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0343
    (SB0993)
Procurement - Equal Pay Certificates - RequirementDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0401
    (SB0994)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work - RevisionsDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0509Green Career Gender Empowerment and Training Pilot ProgramDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0603
    (SB0749)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0740 / CH0678
    (SB0485 / CH0677)
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave InsuranceDelegate KellyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 678Economic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1003 / CH0557
    (SB0481 / CH0556)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkDelegate ValderramaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 557Economic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1106
    (SB0921)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsDelegate FrickVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1172
    (SB0751)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Third Reading Passed (98-41)Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1293Labor and Employment - Break Time for Expression of Breast Milk by Employees - RequirementDelegate MieleIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1303 / CH0410
    (SB0600 / CH0409)
Freestanding Birthing Centers - Use of Ultrasound ImagingDelegate AngelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 410Health and Government Operations
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1357Public Health - State Funding for Abortions - Prohibition and ExceptionsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1574
    (SB1070)
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - PreferencesDelegate HolmesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0001 / CH0325
    (HB0011 / CH0326)
Health Insurance - In Vitro Fertilization - Use of Spouse's Sperm - ExceptionSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 325Finance
1/20/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0092 / CH0343Planned Apprenticeship Standards and On-the-Job Training Activities - RevisionsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 343Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0481 / CH0556
    (HB1003 / CH0557)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 556Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0485 / CH0677
    (HB0740 / CH0678)
Task Force to Study Family and Medical Leave InsuranceSenator PughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0600 / CH0409
    (HB1303 / CH0410)
Freestanding Birthing Centers - Use of Ultrasound ImagingSenator ReillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 409Finance
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0626Health - Medical Procedures - Ultrasound Options (Full Medical Disclosure Act)Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0662Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for PregnancySenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0749
    (HB0603)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0856 / CH0440
    (HB0180 / CH0441)
Public Health - HIV Testing During PregnancySenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 440Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0921
    (HB1106)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsSenator PughVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Finance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0993
    (HB0343)
Procurement - Equal Pay Certificates - RequirementSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0994
    (HB0401)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal Work - RevisionsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1014Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesUtility Regulation (C5)
SB1070
    (HB1574)
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - PreferencesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1108
    (HB0300)
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsSenator SallingIn the House - Favorable Report by Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB1159 / CH0026Baltimore City Board of License Commissioners - Members - Terms and AppointmentSenator ConwayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2016 - 12:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.