Women

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0092
    (SB0498 / CH0453)
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of AuthorityChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0095Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - ExemptionChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0134 / CH0105Homelessness and Supportive Services - Transfer to Department of Housing and Community DevelopmentChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 105Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0190 / CH0220Mammography Centers - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification of Breast Cancer Screening OptionsDelegate QueenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 220Health and Government Operations
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0214Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or ChildbirthDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0518 / CH0668Public Health - Prenatal HIV TestingDelegate MorhaimApproved by the Governor - Chapter 668Health and Government Operations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0775 / CH0221
    (SB0600 / CH0222)
Public Health - Maternal Mental HealthDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 221Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1067 / CH0641Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene ProductsDelegate Miller, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641Appropriations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1138
    (SB1152)
Baltimore City - Table Games Proceeds - Distribution and Recreational FacilitiesDelegate AliIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1167
    (SB0841)
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2017Delegate WivellIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1196Video Lottery Facilities - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Targeted AreasDelegate HornbergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansGaming (C7)
HB1223Public Health - State Funding for Abortions - Prohibition and ExceptionsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1443
    (SB0999)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform ActDelegate GlennIn the House - House Concur - Senate AmendmentsHealth and Government Operations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePublic Health (J1)
HB1506 / CH0633
    (SB0700 / CH0634)
State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - RenamingDelegate GlennApproved by the Governor - Chapter 633Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1517
    (SB0465 / CH0629)
Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program and Fund - Bridge LoansDelegate GlennVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1643Health Insurance - Health Benefit Plans - Special Enrollment Period for PregnancyDelegate LamIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0004 / CH0340Minority Business Enterprises - Program Participation - Requirements and ReauthorizationChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0228 / CH0452Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsSenator SallingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 452Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0498 / CH0453
    (HB0092)
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Transfer of AuthorityChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 453Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0600 / CH0222
    (HB0775 / CH0221)
Public Health - Maternal Mental HealthSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 222Finance
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0625 / CH0642Public Schools and Shelters - Homeless Girls and Women - Feminine Hygiene ProductsSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 642Finance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0636 / CH0478Commission on the Commemoration of the 100th Anniversary of the Passage of the 19th Amendment to the United States ConstitutionSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 478Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0700 / CH0634
    (HB1506 / CH0633)
State Government - Office of Minority Affairs and Interdepartmental Advisory Committee on Minority Affairs - RenamingSenator RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 634Finance
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0841
    (HB1167)
Unborn Child Protection From Dismemberment Abortion Act of 2017Senator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1197Public Health - Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission - Membership, Licensing, and StudiesSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:18 P.M.