Worcester County

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0999Worcester County - Alcoholic BeveragesWorcester County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1164
    (SB0773)
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Diakonia Housing ExpansionDelegate ConwayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1366Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store LicensesDelegate BarnesIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0472
    (HB1179)
Worcester County - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer DecalsSenator MathiasIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0773
    (HB1164)
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Diakonia Housing ExpansionSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0789Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise ParticipationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0949 / CH0584Worcester County - Alcoholic BeveragesSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 584Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.