Worcester County

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0126
    (SB0131)
Worcester County - Recycling at Special Events - ExemptionsDelegate CarozzaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationEnvironment (M3)
HB0299
    (SB0130 / CH0050)
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit for Draft BeerDelegate OttoVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0349 / CH0717
    (SB1162)
Baltimore County - Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)Delegate GrammerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 717Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0526
    (SB0747)
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - FundingDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0697 / CH0112Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor LicenseDelegate OttoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1097
    (SB0729)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramEastern Shore DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1572
    (SB1033 / CH0237)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2015 and 2016Delegate OttoIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedAppropriations
4/9/2016 - 9:30 a.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1573
    (SB1034)
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and MuseumDelegate OttoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0130 / CH0050
    (HB0299)
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit for Draft BeerSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 50Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0131
    (HB0126)
Worcester County - Recycling at Special Events - ExemptionsSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0728
    (HB1143)
Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler SystemsSenator MathiasIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0729
    (HB1097)
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept ProgramSenator HersheyIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0737Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0738Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax CreditSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0747
    (HB0526)
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - FundingSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0941 / CH0595Worcester County - Family Entertainment Centers - Amusement Gaming LicensesSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 595Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0967 / CH0113Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor LicenseSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1033 / CH0237
    (HB1572)
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015 - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and MuseumSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 237Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)
SB1034
    (HB1573)
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and MuseumSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1061Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide AuthorizationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate RulesRulesHunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:06 P.M.