Workers' Compensation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0112Task Force to Study Abuse of Workers' CompensationDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0174
    (SB0247)
Workers' Compensation - Payment for Physician-Dispensed Prescriptions - LimitationsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0370 / CH0226
    (SB0313 / CH0225)
Workers' Compensation - Anne Arundel County Deputy SheriffAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 226Economic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0416Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumption - Duty Belt Worn by Law EnforcementDelegate DeBoyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0472 / CH0119Local Government ArticleSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 119Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0595
    (SB0609)
Workers' Compensation - Retaliation by Employer - ProhibitionDelegate DavisIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0654
    (SB0311)
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability Benefits - CreditDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0664
    (SB0717)
Workers' Compensation Commission - Regulation of Charges - Medical Services and TreatmentDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0808
    (SB0680)
Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation ClaimsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0849
    (SB0579)
Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily AdjustmentDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0873Workers' Compensation - Public Safety EmployeesDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1237
    (SB0139 / CH0184)
Health Care Practitioners - Prescription Drug or Device Dispensing - Medical Facilities or Clinics That Specialize in Treatment Reimbursable Through Workers' Compensation InsuranceDelegate BromwellVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1248Workers' Compensation - Average Weekly Wage - Volunteer Company MemberDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1256Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease - Post-Traumatic Stress DisorderDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB1314
    (SB0681)
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions - Statute of Limitations on ClaimsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1330 / CH0676Workers' Compensation - Insurance Coverage - Employer ComplianceChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 676Economic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1389
    (SB0914)
Workers' Compensation - Reimbursement for Drugs - Fee Schedule and RequirementsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1438
    (SB0962)
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Rate RegulationDelegate JamesonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0065 / CH0016Workers' Compensation - Claim Processing - Electronic Delivery of DecisionsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 16Finance
1/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0139 / CH0184
    (HB1237)
Health Care Practitioners - Prescription Drug or Device Dispensing - Medical Facilities or Clinics That Specialize in Treatment Reimbursable Through Workers' Compensation InsuranceSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 184Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0247
    (HB0174)
Workers' Compensation - Payment for Physician-Dispensed Prescriptions - LimitationsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0311
    (HB0654)
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability Benefits - CreditSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0313 / CH0225
    (HB0370 / CH0226)
Workers' Compensation - Anne Arundel County Deputy SheriffSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 225Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0609
    (HB0595)
Workers' Compensation - Retaliation by Employer - ProhibitionSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0680
    (HB0808)
Health Insurance Carriers - Prompt Payment of Claims - Workers' Compensation ClaimsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0681
    (HB1314)
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions - Statute of Limitations on ClaimsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0717
    (HB0664)
Workers' Compensation Commission - Regulation of Charges - Medical Services and TreatmentSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0914
    (HB1389)
Workers' Compensation - Reimbursement for Drugs - Fee Schedule and RequirementsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceFinanceWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0962
    (HB1438)
Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company - Rate RegulationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesWorkers' Compensation (K1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:30 P.M.