Workers' Compensation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0205 / CH0589Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional OfficersDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 589Economic Matters
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0484Workers' Compensation - Average Weekly Wage - Multiple EmployersDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0814 / CH0207
    (SB0403 / CH0208)
Workers' Compensation - Students in Unpaid Work-Based Learning ExperiencesDelegate PattersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 207Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1307Workers’ Compensation – Complex Regional Pain SyndromeDelegate RoseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1497
    (SB0852)
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability - CreditDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1499 / CH0533
    (SB0575)
Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud ReportingDelegate ValderramaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Economic Matters
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1500 / CH0534
    (SB0979 / CH0535)
Workers’ Compensation – Third–Party Actions – Subsequent Injury FundDelegate ValderramaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 534Economic Matters
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1592 / CH0221
    (SB0851 / CH0222)
Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. - Designation as Employer and MembershipDelegate ValderramaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 221Economic Matters
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)
SB0048 / CH0588Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - State Correctional OfficersSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 588Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0403 / CH0208
    (HB0814 / CH0207)
Workers' Compensation - Students in Unpaid Work-Based Learning ExperiencesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 208Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0575
    (HB1499 / CH0533)
Workers' Compensation - Self-Insured Employers - Suspected Fraud ReportingSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB0825Baltimore City - Sheriff's Office - Appointments, Salaries, and Workers' CompensationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Courts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0851 / CH0222
    (HB1592 / CH0221)
Maryland Jockey Injury Compensation Fund, Inc. – Designation as Employer and MembershipSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 222Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersHorse Racing (C6)
SB0852
    (HB1497)
Workers' Compensation - Temporary Total Disability - CreditSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0979 / CH0535
    (HB1500 / CH0534)
Workers' Compensation - Third-Party Actions - Subsequent Injury FundSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 535Finance
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersWorkers' Compensation (K1)
SB1207Workers' Compensation - Temporary Partial Disability - Concurrent EmploymentSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 2:00 P.M.