Youth

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0031Motor Vehicle Administration - Public Records Inspections - Young PersonsDelegate ConawayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0184 / CH0768Public Health - Treatment of Attention-Deficit/Hyperactivity Disorder - Identification and Posting of InformationDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 768Health and Government Operations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0185 / CH0773Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Distribution of Tobacco Products to Minors - Prohibition and EnforcementDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 773Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0205Drivers' Licenses - Learners' Permits - Minimum DurationDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0335 / CH0563Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 104-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 563Environment and Transportation
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0462 / CH0321
    (SB0701 / CH0320)
Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - AlterationsDelegate Young, P.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321Ways and Means
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0613 / CH0820
    (SB0363 / CH0821)
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and DispensingDelegate HettlemanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820Health and Government Operations
2/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0796
    (SB0748)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemptions - Girl Scouts and Boy ScoutsDelegate MaloneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0809
    (SB0638)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Cumberland YMCA Youth CenterAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0818
    (SB0673)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - National Center on Institutions and Alternatives ExpansionDelegate JonesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0829
    (SB0741)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Jewish Teen Advancement Program HouseDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1187
    (SB0784)
Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget AppropriationDelegate GainesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1197
    (SB0797)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Reporting - DefinitionsDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1228Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - EMAGE CenterDelegate MosbyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1336
    (SB1036)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - The Youth RanchDelegate FoldenIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1465Baltimore City - Police Community Policing Steering CommitteeDelegate HayesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1596
    (SB0121)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Roberta's HouseDelegate BranchIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1611
    (SB1113)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Hopework CDC Youth and Family Service CenterDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1637Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Bon Secours Youth Development CenterDelegate HaynesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HJ0008Establishment of a Presidential Youth CouncilDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0070 / CH0262Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Covered Employment - Youth Sports WorkersSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Finance
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0121
    (HB1596)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Roberta's HouseSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0242Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - St. Francis Neighborhood CenterSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0363 / CH0821
    (HB0613 / CH0820)
Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and DispensingSenator ConwayEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 821Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0638
    (HB0809)
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Cumberland YMCA Youth CenterSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0673
    (HB0818)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - National Center on Institutions and Alternatives ExpansionSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0701 / CH0320
    (HB0462 / CH0321)
Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - AlterationsSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 320Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0741
    (HB0829)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - Jewish Teen Advancement Program HouseSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0748
    (HB0796)
Sales and Use Tax - Exemptions - Girl Scouts and Boy ScoutsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0784
    (HB1187)
Department of Juvenile Services - Youth Services Bureau - Budget AppropriationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0797
    (HB1197)
Child Abuse and Neglect - Reporting - DefinitionsSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1036
    (HB1336)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - The Youth RanchSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1113
    (HB1611)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Hopework CDC Youth and Family Service CenterSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:58 A.M.