Zoning and Planning

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0030Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Repeal of Constitutional Amendment - Changes to Statutory ProvisionsDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0106
    (SB0391)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0173Vehicle Laws - Charles County - Golf Cart ZonesCharles County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0252State Development Plan - RepealDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0256 / CH0610Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Direct Judicial ReviewFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 610Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0302Maryland Medical Marijuana ActDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0409 / CH0521
    (SB0443)
Land Use - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning CycleDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 521Environmental Matters
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB0504
    (SB0370 / CH0463)
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion SystemsDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0675 / CH0134Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Burtonsville MC 14-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 134Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0677 / CH0135Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Glenmont MC 18-13Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 135Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0800
    (SB0524 / CH0492)
Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private WetlandsDelegate FrushIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0949
    (SB0936)
SmartStat Technical Assistance and Support CenterDelegate BoboIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB1257 / CH0674Land Use - Clarifications and CorrectionsDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1385Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Deadline ExtensionDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive NominationsEnvironment (M3)
HB1455 / CH0687Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 687Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
SB0062 / CH0013Community Legacy Program - Application Requirements - Approval by Authorized DesigneeChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 13Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0370 / CH0463
    (HB0504)
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Industrial Wind Energy Conversion SystemsSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 463Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0391
    (HB0106)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0443
    (HB0409 / CH0521)
Land Use - Local Governments - Comprehensive Planning and Zoning CyclesSenator DysonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0524 / CH0492
    (HB0800)
Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private WetlandsSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 492Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0671 / CH0520Land Use - Local Comprehensive Planning and Zoning CycleSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 520Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0936
    (HB0949)
SmartStat Technical Assistance and Support CenterSenator YoungIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesLocal Government - Generally (L6)
SB1022Prince George's County - Green Business ZonesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and Taxation
Finance
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:44 A.M.